This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 11/30/2021 at 05:46:08 (UTC).

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY VS STJOHN, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STJOHN, HEATHER. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN, BREWER, DANIELLE L and DANIELLE BREWER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN

BREWER, DANIELLE L

DANIELLE BREWER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY

Defendant

STJOHN, HEATHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

07/14/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-HEATHER ST JOHN

07/14/2021:ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-HEATHER ST JOHN

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/21/2021:SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

10/22/2021:ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

SETTLMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL F/R INST#202114008415

11/05/2021:SETTLMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL F/R INST#202114008415

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL F/R INST#202114008415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2021 13:30; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Docket Type: PTC; Location: DESOTO COUNTY COURTHOUSE Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-HEATHER ST JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 10/19/2021 at 0130 PM, MA - Judge DANIELLE BREWER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MA 91475

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase 142021SC000271SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R