This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 05:19:33 (UTC).

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY VS BROCKMANN, KATELYN

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROCKMANN, KATELYN. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN, BREWER, DANIELLE L and DANIELLE BREWER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN

BREWER, DANIELLE L

DANIELLE BREWER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY

Defendant

BROCKMANN, KATELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-KATELYN BROCKMANN

08/25/2020:ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-KATELYN BROCKMANN

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

08/20/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

08/20/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY SUB SRVC JUSTIN LANFAIR 9/10/20

09/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY SUB SRVC JUSTIN LANFAIR 9/10/20

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

09/29/2020:SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL F/R INST#202014005941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/29/2020 13:30; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Docket Type: PTC; Location: DESOTO COUNTY COURTHOUSE Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY SUB SRVC JUSTIN LANFAIR 9/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-KATELYN BROCKMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 9/29/2020 at 0130 PM, MA - Judge DANIELLE BREWER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MA 82132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase 142020SC000263SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R