This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 10/16/2021 at 18:06:46 (UTC).

MURRAY, MICHAEL W VS MURRAY, NORA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 MURRAY, MICHAEL W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MURRAY, NORA. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON THOMAS and HALL, DON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON THOMAS

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MURRAY, MICHAEL W

Respondent

MURRAY, NORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SEGUR, ROBERT WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE F/R INST#202114007713

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FL DL (HUSBAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPRENUPTIAL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MA 93376

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 142021DR000433DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEGUR, ROBERT WILLIAM