This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 08/26/2020 at 23:02:46 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS RANGER, MAXWELL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RANGER, MAXWELL. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BREWER, DANIELLE L, BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN and DANIELLE BREWER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BREWER, DANIELLE L

BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN

DANIELLE BREWER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

RANGER, MAXWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RET'D SERVED MAXWELL RANGER 8/20/2020

08/24/2020:SUMMONS RET'D SERVED MAXWELL RANGER 8/20/2020

COMPLAINT

07/28/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/28/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED-MAXWELL RANGER

08/04/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED-MAXWELL RANGER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/29/2020 13:30; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Docket Type: PTC; Location: DESOTO COUNTY COURTHOUSE Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RET'D SERVED MAXWELL RANGER 8/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-MAXWELL RANGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 9/29/2020 at 0130 PM, MA - Judge DANIELLE BREWER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MA 81513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCase 142020SC000233SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E