This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County on 06/12/2019 at 20:01:46 (UTC).

MATHEWSON, APRIL VS CRUZ, ADRIAN MONDRAGON Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 MATHEWSON, APRIL filed an Other lawsuit against CRUZ, ADRIAN MONDRAGON. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHEWSON, APRIL

Defendants

CRUZ, ADRIAN MONDRAGON

HERNANDEZ, NAYELI NA MENDOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FROHLICH, CHRISTOPHER ERIC

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS ADRIAN MANDRAGON CRUZ'S AND NAYELI NA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

06/04/2019:DEFENDANTS ADRIAN MANDRAGON CRUZ'S AND NAYELI NA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ 5/23/19

05/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ 5/23/19

RCVD BY NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ 5/16/19

05/24/2019:RCVD BY NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ 5/16/19

PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

05/14/2019:PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED (ADRIAN CRUZ)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (ADRIAN CRUZ)

SUMMONS ISSUED (NAYELINA MENDOZA)

05/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (NAYELINA MENDOZA)

DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

05/14/2019:DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

COMPLAINT

05/14/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS ADRIAN MANDRAGON CRUZ'S AND NAYELI NA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ 5/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RCVD BY NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ 5/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Judge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ADRIAN MONDRAGON CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT NAYELINA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (ADRIAN CRUZ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (NAYELINA MENDOZA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MA 69869

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Case 142019CA000233CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FROHLICH, CHRISTOPHER