This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 03/03/2022 at 05:52:44 (UTC).

LEGGON, PRAYTHER VS GILCHRIST, MANNEIQUA Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LEGGON, PRAYTHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GILCHRIST, MANNEIQUA. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T and HALL, DON THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

HALL, DON THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEGGON, PRAYTHER

Respondents

GILCHRIST, MANNEIQUA

OUTING, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 1/7/22 @1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK (THOMAS OUTING ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (THOMAS OUTING ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING-1/7/22 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FILED BY RESPONDENT M. GILCHRIST CC: SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-THOMAS OUTING 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-MANNEIQUA GILCHRIST 11/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDUPLICATE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-THOMAS OUTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-MANNEIQUA GILCHRIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDUPLICATE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF MINOR BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCase 142021DR000479DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL