This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County on 06/07/2019 at 20:00:18 (UTC).

DESOTO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRIC VS DOE 1, JANE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 DESOTO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRIC filed an Other lawsuit against DOE 1, JANE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESOTO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRIC

Defendants

DOE 2, JANE

DOE 1, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BENNETT, SAMUEL PAUL

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT MANDATORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

05/31/2019:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT MANDATORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, JANE DOE 2'S PRO SE MOTION

05/31/2019:ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, JANE DOE 2'S PRO SE MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/03/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRO SE MOTION FILED - SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

05/31/2019:PRO SE MOTION FILED - SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED (JANE DOE #1)

05/31/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED (JANE DOE #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/28/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/28/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING EXTENDED EVIDENTIARY HEARING-5/31/19 AT 10:30 A.M.

05/24/2019:ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING EXTENDED EVIDENTIARY HEARING-5/31/19 AT 10:30 A.M.

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED- JANE DOE #2 5/16/19

05/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED- JANE DOE #2 5/16/19

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-JANE DOE #1 5/16/19

05/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-JANE DOE #1 5/16/19

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT MANDATORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, JANE DOE 2'S PRO SE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRO SE MOTION FILED - SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED (JANE DOE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING EXTENDED EVIDENTIARY HEARING-5/31/19 AT 10:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED- JANE DOE #2 5/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (JANE DOE 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED (JANE DOE 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY & PERMANENT MANDATORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF & INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MANDATORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MA 69712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case 142019CA000219CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMUEL P BENNETT, ESQ