This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 14:59:18 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Et Al VS WORTH, SAMANTHA ANN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2014 DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against WORTH, SAMANTHA ANN. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, JAMES S, GLORIA DEMEDIO, BONNER, KIMBERLY, HALL, DON THOMAS, LAURA HALE and HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, JAMES S

GLORIA DEMEDIO

BONNER, KIMBERLY

HALL, DON THOMAS

LAURA HALE

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KING, MARY M

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

WORTH, SAMANTHA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EARL, DAVID G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER & ORDER ON DOR'S MOTION TO ABATE ONGOING SUP & EST ARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPARTY ADDRESSES (COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEvent CSH scheduled on 10/7/2020 at 0900 AM, MA - Judge LAURA HALE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE ONGOING SUPPORT & ESTABLISH ARREARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING :10/7/20 @9AM (VIA ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketWBA RETURNED CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketORDER DISSOLVING WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (EMAILED TO DCSO THIS DATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -SUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT & OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • DocketCase 142014DR000391DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID G EARL