This case was last updated from Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/14/2023 at 11:02:33 (UTC).

TATE, ANNIE Et Al VS SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 TATE, ANNIE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court , Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON THOMAS and HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON THOMAS

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TATE, ROY

TATE, ANNIE

Defendant

SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REICH, OREN DAVID

Defendant Attorney

SALEHI, TANAZ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/05/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

06/05/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED-SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

06/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED-SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

06/05/2023:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

06/05/2023:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY 6/7/23

06/07/2023:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY 6/7/23

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/16/2023:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/16/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANNIE TATE

06/21/2023:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANNIE TATE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ROY TATE

06/21/2023:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ROY TATE

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

06/21/2023:DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

06/27/2023:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

07/11/2023:AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

07/24/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY

07/26/2023:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY

MOTION TO DISMISS & IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

07/28/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS & IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO DISMISS & IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ROY TATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING IT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANNIE TATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
06/05/2023

DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-SAFE HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MA 111913

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCase 142023CA000393CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/5/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less