This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 09/11/2023 at 08:52:39 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC VS CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUP Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUP. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLOWERS, GUY ALAN and FLOWERS, GUY A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLOWERS, GUY ALAN

FLOWERS, GUY A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendants

CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUP

SAUNDERS, DELROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS, THOMAS LEE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

08/22/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

08/22/2023:COMPLAINT

STANDING ORDER

08/22/2023:STANDING ORDER

CASE REPORT

08/22/2023:CASE REPORT

SUMMONS ISSUED-CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUPS INC

08/22/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED-CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUPS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED-DELROY SAUNDERS

08/29/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED-DELROY SAUNDERS

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2023

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MA 115018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-DELROY SAUNDERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketJudge: FLOWERS , GUY A HONORABLE Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-CONSOLIDATED PRODUCTIONS GROUPS INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTANDING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MA 114798

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketCase 142023CC000356CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less