This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County on 11/29/2021 at 04:07:17 (UTC).

BROWN, DONTAE VS CABROL, GEO PIERRE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 BROWN, DONTAE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CABROL, GEO PIERRE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T and HALL, DON THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

HALL, DON THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, DONTAE

Defendants

CABROL, GEO PIERRE

YVROSE SIMEON CABRO, MARIE FRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTH, JOSEPH ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

KEMP, TRAVIS D.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING-11/19/21 AT 1:30 PM

11/15/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING-11/19/21 AT 1:30 PM

NOTICE OF HEARING 11/29/2021 @2:15PM (ZOOM)

11/12/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING 11/29/2021 @2:15PM (ZOOM)

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOCONFERENCE DEPOSITION 11/22/21 @9:30AM

11/12/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOCONFERENCE DEPOSITION 11/22/21 @9:30AM

NOTICE OF HEARING 11/19/21 @1:30PM (ZOOM)

11/04/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING 11/19/21 @1:30PM (ZOOM)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

11/03/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, GEO PIERRE CABROL

11/03/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, GEO PIERRE CABROL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DONTAE BROWN) 9/14/21 @10AM (VIA ZOOM)

07/06/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DONTAE BROWN) 9/14/21 @10AM (VIA ZOOM)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/09/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/03/2021:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, DONTAE BROWN'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, DONTAE BROWN'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, DONTAE BROWN'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, DONTAE BROWN'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION'S DATED APRIL 5, 2021

05/05/2021:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION'S DATED APRIL 5, 2021

PLAINTIFF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

04/28/2021:PLAINTIFF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2021:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2021:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

04/12/2021:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEO PIERRE CABROL

04/12/2021:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEO PIERRE CABROL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

04/12/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING-11/19/21 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 11/29/2021 @2:15PM (ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOCONFERENCE DEPOSITION 11/22/21 @9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 11/19/21 @1:30PM (ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, MARIE FRANCE YVROSE SIMEON CABROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO THE DEFENDANT, GEO PIERRE CABROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DONTAE BROWN) 9/14/21 @10AM (VIA ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, DONTAE BROWN'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MA 87555

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-GEO PIERRE CABROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-MARIE FRANCE YVROSE CABROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 142021CA000104CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer North, Joseph Robert