This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County on 06/20/2019 at 20:00:35 (UTC).

BENNETT, ROBERT EDWARD VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 BENNETT, ROBERT EDWARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT, ROBERT EDWARD

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPA

MCEWEN, PAMELA GAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANTIAGO, ROLANDO JOSE

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

06/18/2019:DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANT PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/18/2019:DEFENDANT PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING ROS-SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED-TISH GASTON FOR LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE 5/28/19

06/12/2019:NOTICE OF FILING ROS-SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED-TISH GASTON FOR LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE 5/28/19

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

05/21/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED-LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED-PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING ROS-SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED-TISH GASTON FOR LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE 5/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MA 70114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-PAMELA GAIL MCEWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Case 142019CA000256CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANTIAGO , ROLANDO JOSE