This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 18:04:01 (UTC).

BARBER AND OBO ANYSTON MORR, A VS MORR, DAVID JR

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 BARBER AND OBO ANYSTON MORR, A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MORR, DAVID JR. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T, HALL, DON THOMAS and DON HALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

HALL, DON THOMAS

DON HALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARBER AND OBO ANYSTON MORR, A

Respondent

MORR, DAVID JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMP INJ FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S REQUEST TO DISMISS FINAL INJ FOR PROTECTECTION (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketTEMP INJ RETURNED FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DV W/ MC SERVED-DAVID MORR JR 8/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEvent TROH scheduled on 9/9/2020 at 1000 AM, MA - Judge DON HALL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN - 9/9/20 @10AM CC DCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketVIOLENCE PROTECTION INFORMATION TRACKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase 142020DR000357DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARBER is a litigant