This case was last updated from Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2019 at 20:01:18 (UTC).

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC VS DESOTO COUNTY FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DESOTO COUNTY FLORIDA. This case was filed in Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court , Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

Defendants

MERCER, ANGELA K

DESOTO COUNTY FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFITHS, HEATHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

07/08/2019:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

07/08/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

07/08/2019:CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

SUMMONS ISSUED-ANGELA K. MERCER

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-ANGELA K. MERCER

SUMMONS ISSUED-DESOTO COUNTY, FL C/O BOCC

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-DESOTO COUNTY, FL C/O BOCC

SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN TENANT

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN TENANT

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN) NON SERVED 7/18/19

07/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN) NON SERVED 7/18/19

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED & MAILED TO DESOTO SUN FOR PUB

07/31/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED & MAILED TO DESOTO SUN FOR PUB

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED & MAILED TO DESOTO SUN FOR PUB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION UPON UNKNOWN TENANT AS DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (UNK TEN) NON SERVED 7/18/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number MA 71565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $935.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-DESOTO COUNTY, FL C/O BOCC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-ANGELA K. MERCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS F/R INST# 201914004499

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCase 142019CA000338CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESOTO COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATHER GRIFFITHS