This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 03/19/2022 at 18:14:53 (UTC).

AGUILAR, MAKAYLA VS AGUILAR, EDDIE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 AGUILAR, MAKAYLA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AGUILAR, EDDIE. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON THOMAS and HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON THOMAS

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILAR, MAKAYLA

Respondent

AGUILAR, EDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $392.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN & COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND/FATHER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF FILING ENLARGED COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EDDIE AGUILAR 2/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMINOR CHILD QUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCompliance PPLAN has been created with due date of 3/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase 142022DR000078DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL