This case was last updated from Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/30/2019 at 20:00:33 (UTC).

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS CASTILLO, CARLOS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CASTILLO, CARLOS. This case was filed in Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court , Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

CASTILLO, CARLOS

DESOTO COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBD

TENANT, UNKNOWN

CASTILLO, DIANA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, LESLIE SINGLETERRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT

07/31/2019:COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATION

07/31/2019:PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/31/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

07/31/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

07/31/2019:DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/31/2019:PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED (CARLOS CASTILLO)

07/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (CARLOS CASTILLO)

SUMMONS ISSUED (DIANA CASTILLO)

07/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (DIANA CASTILLO)

SUMMONS ISSUED (DESOTO CNTY)

07/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (DESOTO CNTY)

SUMMONS ISSUED (USA IRS)

07/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (USA IRS)

SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN)

07/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN)

CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE USA

08/14/2019:CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE USA

RETURN OF SERVICE (USA IRS) SUMMONS RCVD BY SHELBY HILL 8/9/19

08/22/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (USA IRS) SUMMONS RCVD BY SHELBY HILL 8/9/19

RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY Y HERNANDEZ 8/15/19

08/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY Y HERNANDEZ 8/15/19

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED-UNKNOWN TENANT 8/20/19 AT 4 P.M.

08/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED-UNKNOWN TENANT 8/20/19 AT 4 P.M.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED-UNKNOWN TENANT 8/20/19 AT 4 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY Y HERNANDEZ 8/15/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (USA IRS) SUMMONS RCVD BY SHELBY HILL 8/9/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE USA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (UNK TEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (USA IRS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (DESOTO CNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (DIANA CASTILLO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (CARLOS CASTILLO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $955.00 Receipt Number MA 72276

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $955.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCase 142019CA000378CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESOTO COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer White, Leslie S