This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/12/2023 at 08:10:12 (UTC).

Whitaker, Garlin D

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Whitaker, Garlin D was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Whitaker, Garlin D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/29/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/29/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/29/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/29/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/29/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

12/30/2022: First Appearance Court Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/29/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/23/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.07(2)(B) Battery On Leo, Firefighter, Emt, Etc; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • ChargeBattery on LEO, Firefighter, EMT, etc; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.07(2)(b); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less