This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 10:11:58 (UTC).

West, Derik Jermaine

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 West, Derik Jermaine was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

West, Derik Jermaine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

White, Christian D

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/28/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/28/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/28/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/28/2022: JIS Certificate

First Appearance Court Order

11/28/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Driving Record

11/29/2022: Driving Record

Citation # AGHMC2E for 322.34(2)(c) issued on 11/24/2022 by Florida Highway Patrol; Count: 1

12/02/2022: Citation # AGHMC2E for 322.34(2)(c) issued on 11/24/2022 by Florida Highway Patrol; Count: 1

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/06/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/09/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/13/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Discovery

12/14/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

12/19/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

01/13/2023: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

01/17/2023: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

Notice of Discovery

01/24/2023: Notice of Discovery

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketContinued to 2/23/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGHMC2E for 322.34(2)(c) issued on 11/24/2022 by Florida Highway Patrol; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/19/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 322.34(2)(C) Drive While License Suspended, Revoked 3Rd Or Subsequent Offense - Resulting From Dui, Refusal To Submit, Traffic Offense Cause Death/Serious Injury/Flee Or Elude; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • ChargeDrive while License Suspended, Revoked 3rd or Subsequent Offense - resulting from DUI, refusal to submit, traffic offense cause death/serious injury/flee or elude; Count: 1; Statute #: 322.34(2)(c); Citation #: AGHMC2E; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-12-19; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less