This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 08:06:33 (UTC).

Verbance, Daniel Joseph

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Verbance, Daniel Joseph was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Verbance, Daniel Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/30/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/30/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/30/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/30/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/30/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/03/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

01/03/2023: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

01/03/2023: Inventory of Firearms

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513816-0; Count: 1

01/03/2023: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513816-0; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459937-7; Count: 2

01/03/2023: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459937-7; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459938-0; Count: 3

01/03/2023: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459938-0; Count: 3

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459938-0; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $5,000.00; 580459937-7; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513816-0; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relinquish Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNo Trespass Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNo Contact Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/23/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 914.22(1)(E) Hinder Witness Communication/Information To Leo/Judge In 3Rd Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.041(2)(A) Domestic Battery By Strangulation; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeHinder Witness Communication/Information to LEO/Judge in 3rd Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 3; Statute #: 914.22(1)(e); Offense Level: FS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 2; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeDomestic Battery by Strangulation; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.041(2)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less