This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/22/2022 at 10:01:18 (UTC).

Sylvester, Steven

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Sylvester, Steven was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sylvester, Steven Carl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

White, Christian D

 

Court Documents

Waiver of Appearance

07/25/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Discovery

07/18/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

07/18/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear

07/18/2022: Notice to Appear

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/15/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Citation # AFUDAOE for 316.1935(2) issued on 06/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

06/23/2022: Citation # AFUDAOE for 316.1935(2) issued on 06/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/27/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Email Permission Form

06/24/2022: Email Permission Form

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/24/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $15,000.00; 527410227-3; Count: 1

06/24/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $15,000.00; 527410227-3; Count: 1

First Appearance Court Order

06/24/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/23/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

06/23/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/23/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

06/23/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Booking Sheet

06/23/2022: Booking Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: defendant to state correct email address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDefendant - Notice Returned Undeliverable - Invalid Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketContinued to 9/15/2022 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 6/23/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/18/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 316.1935(2) Flee, Attempt To Elude Leo With Lights Sirens Activated; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AFUDAOE for 316.1935(2) issued on 06/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • ChargeFlee, Attempt to Elude Drive at High Speed or with Wanton Disregard for Safety Person, Property LEO with Lights Sirens Activated; Count: 1; Statute #: 316.1935(3)(a); Citation #: AFUDAOE; Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer White, Christian D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Laura Natasha