This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/13/2022 at 09:02:11 (UTC).

Sturgis, Emily Marie

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Sturgis, Emily Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sturgis, Emily Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Hurst, Shannon Lynn

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/15/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/15/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/15/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/15/2022: JIS Certificate

First Appearance Court Order

11/16/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448587-8; Count: 1

11/16/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448587-8; Count: 1

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/18/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/22/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/05/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

12/12/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

12/12/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

Notice of Discovery

12/12/2022: Notice of Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketContinued to 1/10/2023 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/12/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/15/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)1 Grand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • ChargeGrand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(2)(c)1; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-12-12; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less