This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 10:13:30 (UTC).

Sincere, Brandon Lamar

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Sincere, Brandon Lamar was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sincere, Brandon Lamar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Hurst, Shannon Lynn

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

12/05/2022: Notice to Appear

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/02/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/02/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/30/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/28/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Property Receipt

11/22/2022: Property Receipt

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $75,000.00; 2022-Ee-002417; Count: 1

11/22/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $75,000.00; 2022-Ee-002417; Count: 1

Email Permission Form

11/21/2022: Email Permission Form

Notice of Defendant's Invocation of Rights

11/16/2022: Notice of Defendant's Invocation of Rights

Inventory of Firearms

11/15/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/15/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

11/15/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order Prohibiting Travel and Order Requiring Defendant to Surrender Passport and Travel Documents as a Condition of Pretrial Release

11/14/2022: Order Prohibiting Travel and Order Requiring Defendant to Surrender Passport and Travel Documents as a Condition of Pretrial Release

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/14/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

11/14/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/14/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

11/14/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Booking Sheet

11/14/2022: Booking Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketContinued to 1/12/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/5/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/14/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 782.07(1) Manslaughter; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2022
  • ChargeManslaughter; Count: 1; Statute #: 782.07(1); Offense Level: FF; Plea Date: 2022-12-05; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less