This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 08:10:34 (UTC).

Simon, Carlos Martinez

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Simon, Carlos Martinez was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Crown, Rob. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Crown, Rob

 

Party Details

Defendant

Simon, Carlos Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Damrath, Colleen T

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/29/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/29/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/29/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/29/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/29/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Jail Arrest Card

12/30/2022: Jail Arrest Card

First Appearance Court Order

01/03/2023: First Appearance Court Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/30/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 1/25/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Adams, Blake (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/29/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeKnowingly/Intentionally Unlawful Possession of 4 or Fewer Personal ID Info of Another; Count: 1; Statute #: 817.5685(3)(a); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.5685(3)(A) Knowingly/Intentionally Unlawful Possession Of 4 Or Fewer Personal Id Info Of Another; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less