This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/04/2023 at 09:00:44 (UTC).

Sills, Kristin Eileen

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 Sills, Kristin Eileen was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, Michael J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sills, Kristin Eileen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Day Jr, Donald Paul

Damrath, Colleen T

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/07/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/07/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/07/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/07/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

12/07/2022: Email Permission Form

Driving Record

12/07/2022: Driving Record

Cash bond for $2,000.00; 69608; Count: 1

12/07/2022: Cash bond for $2,000.00; 69608; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/08/2022: Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Waiver of Appearance

12/08/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/27/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Cancelled Arraignment - Misdemeanor on 12/28/2022 8:30:00 AM due to Order

12/28/2022: Cancelled Arraignment - Misdemeanor on 12/28/2022 8:30:00 AM due to Order

Re-notice to Appear

12/28/2022: Re-notice to Appear

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketSet on Pre-Trial (Private Attorney) docket 2/8/2023 beginning at 9:00 AM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Misdemeanor on 12/28/2022 8:30:00 AM due to Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Docket843.02 Resist/Obstruct Officer Without Violence; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialCash Bond Posted; Amount Due: 2000.0; Amount Paid: 2000.0; Amount Due: 2000.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 12/28/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCash bond for $2,000.00; 69608; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 843.02 Resist/Obstruct Officer Without Violence; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • ChargeResist/Obstruct Officer without Violence; Count: 1; Statute #: 843.02; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less