This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/19/2022 at 10:02:29 (UTC).

Senat, Wilkensky

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Senat, Wilkensky was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Senat, Wilkensky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Dickson, David William

 

Court Documents

Notice of Discovery

08/17/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

08/01/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

07/20/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

07/15/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

07/15/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: Notice to Clerk

Notice to Appear

07/15/2022: Notice to Appear

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/15/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

07/07/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/27/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Inventory of Firearms

06/20/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

06/20/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

06/20/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/20/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

06/20/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/20/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

06/20/2022: Jail Arrest Card

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketContinued to 9/15/2022 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/11/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 810.02(2)(A) Burglary With Assault Or Battery; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 3; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-08-01; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 2; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-08-01; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeBurglary Occupied Dwelling; Count: 1; Statute #: 810.02(3)(a); Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-08-01; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dickson, David William

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Laura Natasha