This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 07:14:43 (UTC).

Schimitsch , Ava Rose

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 Schimitsch , Ava Rose was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adams, Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adams, Blake

 

Party Details

Defendant

Schimitsch , Ava Rose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Newkirk, Amanda M

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

01/18/2023: Notice to Appear

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 2/1/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket562.11(1)(A) Sell, Give, Serve Alcohol Person Under 21 Yoa; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • ChargeSell, Give, Serve Alcohol Person Under 21 YOA; Count: 1; Statute #: 562.11(1)(a); Offense Level: MS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less