This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/18/2022 at 21:26:20 (UTC).

Santiago Parra, Yadira Magali

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Santiago Parra, Yadira Magali was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Provost, Michael J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Provost, Michael J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Santiago Parra, Yadira Magali

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Stewart, James Frederick

Fink, Michael Gordon

Walker, Andrew Nicholas

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/06/2021: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/06/2021: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/06/2021: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/06/2021: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/06/2021: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Surety Bond by 1st Out Bail Bonds - James White for $1,000.00; As1k-559061; Count: 1

12/06/2021: Surety Bond by 1st Out Bail Bonds - James White for $1,000.00; As1k-559061; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address by Fink, Michael Gordon

12/21/2021: Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address by Fink, Michael Gordon

Notice of Discovery

12/21/2021: Notice of Discovery

Written Plea of Not Guilty and Waiver of Arraignment

12/21/2021: Written Plea of Not Guilty and Waiver of Arraignment

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

12/27/2021: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/27/2021: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Misdemeanor on 12/28/2021 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address by Fink, Michael Gordon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty and Waiver of Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 12/28/2021 beginning at 8:30 AM Nicola, Tamara L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by 1st Out Bail Bonds - James White for $1,000.00; As1k-559061; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPrincipal 856.021 Loitering Or Prowling; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • ChargeLoitering or Prowling; Count: 1; Statute #: 856.021; Disposition Date: 2021-12-27; Offense Level: MS; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less