This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 07:16:18 (UTC).

Santa Crose, Christina Nicole, SANTACRUZ, CHRISTINA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Santa Crose, Christina Nicole, SANTACRUZ, CHRISTINA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendants

Santa Crose, Christina Nicole

SANTACRUZ, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Verderamo, James Derek

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/06/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/06/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/06/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/06/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/06/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

01/06/2023: Driving Record

First Appearance Court Order

01/09/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $1,000.00; Psc50-1923367; Count: 3

01/09/2023: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $1,000.00; Psc50-1923367; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $2,000.00; Psc50-1923368; Count: 1

01/09/2023: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $2,000.00; Psc50-1923368; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

01/11/2023: Notice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

01/11/2023: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

01/11/2023: Waiver of Appearance

Email Permission Form

01/12/2023: Email Permission Form

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $2,000.00; Psc50-1923368; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $1,000.00; Psc50-1923367; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: BA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/30/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less