This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/10/2023 at 08:06:22 (UTC).

Sanjuan, Luis Manuel

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Sanjuan, Luis Manuel was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sanjuan, Luis Manuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Woodward, Sarah Ann

PD, Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/27/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/27/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/27/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/27/2022: JIS Certificate

First Appearance Court Order

12/27/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Driving Record

12/27/2022: Driving Record

Citation # AGW0D4E for 322.341 issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

12/27/2022: Citation # AGW0D4E for 322.341 issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

Citation # AGW0D3E for 316.1935(3)(a) issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

12/27/2022: Citation # AGW0D3E for 316.1935(3)(a) issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/06/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/17/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 843.02 Resist/Obstruct Officer Without Violence; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 322.341 Drive On Permanently Revoked Dl; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 316.1935(3)(A) Flee, Attempt To Elude Drive At High Speed Or With Wanton Disregard For Safety Person, Property Leo With Lights Sirens Activated; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGW0D3E for 316.1935(3)(a) issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGW0D4E for 322.341 issued on 12/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeResist/Obstruct Officer without Violence; Count: 4; Statute #: 843.02; Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeDrive on Permanently Revoked DL; Count: 2; Statute #: 322.341; Citation #: AGW0D4E; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeFlee, Attempt to Elude Drive at High Speed or with Wanton Disregard for Safety Person, Property LEO with Lights Sirens Activated; Count: 1; Statute #: 316.1935(3)(a); Citation #: AGW0D3E; Offense Level: FS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less