This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/22/2022 at 10:00:32 (UTC).

Sanders, Shane Adrian

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Sanders, Shane Adrian was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sanders, Shane Adrian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Woodward, Sarah Ann

Ramos, Toni A

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Bond

08/09/2022: Order Setting Bond

Notice of Discovery

08/08/2022: Notice of Discovery

Warrant/Order electronically rejected by CCSO

08/08/2022: Warrant/Order electronically rejected by CCSO

Order to Take into Custody

08/08/2022: Order to Take into Custody

Notice of Discovery

08/08/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Hearing for Motion To Set Bond At 11:00Am

07/22/2022: Notice of Hearing for Motion To Set Bond At 11:00Am

Notice of Discovery

07/22/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

07/22/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

07/18/2022: Notice to Appear

Motion to Set Bond

07/15/2022: Motion to Set Bond

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/15/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

07/11/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/27/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/24/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

First Appearance Court Order

06/24/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/23/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant/Order electronically rejected by CCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Take into Custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Motion To Set Bond To Be Heard At 11:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketMotion to Set Bond - Granted - Counts 1, 2 and 3 Remain the Same. Count 4 is Set at $10,000 and Count 5 is Set at $5,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 6/23/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 539.001(8)(B)8B Provide False Owner Info Of Pawned Items Receive $300 Or More; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.019(1) Dealing In Stolen Property; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)1 Grand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • ChargeProvide False Owner Info of Pawned Items Receive $300 or More; Count: 5; Statute #: 539.001(8)(b)8b; Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • ChargeDealing in Stolen Property; Count: 4; Statute #: 812.019(1); Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • ChargeProvide False Owner Info of Pawned Items Receive < $300; Count: 3; Statute #: 539.001(8)(b)8a; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • ChargeDealing in Stolen Property; Count: 2; Statute #: 812.019(1); Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • ChargePetit Theft 1st Degree $100 - < $750; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(2)(e); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramos, Toni A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woodward, Sarah Ann