This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/28/2022 at 09:14:33 (UTC).

Sagesse , Ender

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Sagesse , Ender was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sagesse , Ender

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Verderamo, James Derek

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/30/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/30/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/30/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/30/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/30/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

12/01/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448602-8; Count: 1

12/01/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448602-8; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448603-1; Count: 2

12/01/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580448603-1; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $1,000.00; 580449125-7; Count: 3

12/01/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $1,000.00; 580449125-7; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $2,000.00; 580449126-0; Count: 4

12/01/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $2,000.00; 580449126-0; Count: 4

Notice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/09/2022: Notice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

12/09/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

12/09/2022: Waiver of Appearance

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McFee, Shannon H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Verderamo, James Derek, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $2,000.00; 580449126-0; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/30/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • ChargePossess New, Prescription Drug without Prescription; Count: 3; Statute #: 499.03(1); Offense Level: MS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • ChargeSell, Deliver, Manufacture, Possess with Intent to Sell or Deliver a Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(1)(a)2; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 499.03(1) Possess New, Prescription Drug Without Prescription; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(1)(A)2 Sell, Deliver, Manufacture, Possess With Intent To Sell Or Deliver A Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less