This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/11/2023 at 09:03:01 (UTC).

Royals, Terence Lee

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 Royals, Terence Lee was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Royals, Terence Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Day Jr, Donald Paul

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/14/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/14/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/14/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/14/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/14/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

12/14/2022: Driving Record

First Appearance Court Order

12/15/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068531; Count: 1

12/19/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068531; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068532; Count: 2

12/19/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068532; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068533; Count: 3

12/19/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-068533; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-068534; Count: 4

12/19/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-068534; Count: 4

Application For Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes (Defendant Is Not Indigent - See Line 19)

12/20/2022: Application For Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes (Defendant Is Not Indigent - See Line 19)

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

12/20/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

01/05/2023: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

01/06/2023: Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Appear

01/09/2023: Notice to Appear

Waiver of Appearance

01/09/2023: Waiver of Appearance

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketContinued to 2/14/2023 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/9/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less