This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/17/2023 at 10:06:18 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Pedro A

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Rodriguez, Pedro A was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Rodriguez, Pedro A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Heiderscheit, N Stowe

Bazaz, Salim Joseph

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

01/09/2023: Notice to Appear

Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Hurst, Shannon Lynn BAR # 131880 (Public Defender)

01/06/2023: Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Hurst, Shannon Lynn BAR # 131880 (Public Defender)

Notice of Discovery

01/03/2023: Notice of Discovery

Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

12/20/2022: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

Notice to Appear

12/19/2022: Notice to Appear

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/19/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Appearance from Bazaz, Salim Joseph, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/14/2022: Notice of Appearance from Bazaz, Salim Joseph, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/08/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/01/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/28/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Defendant's Invocation of Rights

11/28/2022: Notice of Defendant's Invocation of Rights

Inventory of Firearms

11/21/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/21/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

11/21/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Booking Sheet

11/18/2022: Booking Sheet

Order Prohibiting Travel and Order Requiring Defendant to Surrender Passport and Travel Documents as a Condition of Pretrial Release

11/18/2022: Order Prohibiting Travel and Order Requiring Defendant to Surrender Passport and Travel Documents as a Condition of Pretrial Release

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/18/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

11/18/2022: JIS Certificate

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketContinued to 2/23/2023 1:30 PM Case Mgmt (Private Attorney) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Hurst, Shannon Lynn BAR # 131880 (Public Defender)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/18/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/12/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 794.011(2)(A) Sex Battery Or In Attempt Sex Battery Injure Sex Organs By Person 18 Yoa Or Older Victim < 12 Yoa; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • ChargeSex Battery or In Attempt Sex Battery Injure Sex Organs by Person 18 YOA or Older Victim < 12 YOA; Count: 1; Statute #: 794.011(2)(a); Offense Level: FC; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less