This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/20/2022 at 09:10:53 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Inocencia

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Rodriguez, Inocencia was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Rodriguez, Inocencia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/22/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/22/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

11/23/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/23/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

11/23/2022: Inventory of Firearms

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

12/01/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/12/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 12/5/2022 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relinquish Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNo Trespass Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNo Contact Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/22/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/5/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(2) Battery - 2Nd Or Subsequent Offense; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • ChargeBattery - 2nd or Subsequent Offense; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(2); Disposition Date: 2022-12-01; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Laura Natasha