This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 11/12/2022 at 10:05:19 (UTC).

Rodriguez Estrada , Braya

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 Rodriguez Estrada , Braya was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, Michael J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Rodriguez Estrada , Braya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Gomes, Rhiannon A

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability

11/08/2022: Notice of Unavailability

Notice to Appear

11/08/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

10/25/2022: Notice of Discovery

Order Modifying Bond Conditions

10/07/2022: Order Modifying Bond Conditions

Notice to Appear

10/07/2022: Notice to Appear

Waiver of Appearance

09/26/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Waiver of Appearance

09/26/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

09/26/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

09/26/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

09/21/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Hearing for Motion To Set Bond To Be Heard At 9:00A.M.

09/20/2022: Notice of Hearing for Motion To Set Bond To Be Heard At 9:00A.M.

Email Permission Form

09/16/2022: Email Permission Form

Motion to Set Bond

09/19/2022: Motion to Set Bond

Sworn Affidavit or Complaint

09/16/2022: Sworn Affidavit or Complaint

Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-048873; Count: 1

09/16/2022: Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-048873; Count: 1

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

09/15/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

09/15/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

09/15/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: DV Pre-Trial Conference - Criminal; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: DV Pre-Trial Conference - Criminal; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketContinued to 12/19/2022 9:30 AM DV Pre-Trial Conference - Criminal Brown, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketRequest of Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Brown, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 9/15/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 10/7/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet Served Capias/Arrest Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketWarrant received by CCSO electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Docket784.048(2) Willfully, Maliciously, Repeatedly Follow, Harass, Cyberstalk; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Capias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • ChargeWillfully, Maliciously, Repeatedly Follow, Harass, Cyberstalk; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.048(2); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less