This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/21/2022 at 10:09:43 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Crystal Dawn, STEPHENS, CRYSTAL DAWN Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Rodriguez, Crystal Dawn, STEPHENS, CRYSTAL DAWN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendants

Rodriguez, Crystal Dawn

STEPHENS, CRYSTAL DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

RC, Regional Counsel

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

10/07/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

09/21/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Appearance from RC, Regional Counsel, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

09/14/2022: Notice of Appearance from RC, Regional Counsel, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Order to Withdraw Attorney of Record Ward, Zachary Howes BAR # 112272 (Public Defender) and Order Appointing RC, Regional Counsel

09/14/2022: Order to Withdraw Attorney of Record Ward, Zachary Howes BAR # 112272 (Public Defender) and Order Appointing RC, Regional Counsel

Certification of Conflict

09/14/2022: Certification of Conflict

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

09/12/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice to Appear

09/12/2022: Notice to Appear

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

09/12/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 7

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 7

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

09/01/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

08/30/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

First Appearance Court Order

08/23/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Driving Record

08/22/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

08/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

08/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

08/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

08/22/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Booking Sheet

08/22/2022: Booking Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) docket 11/17/2022 beginning at 9:00 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPer State Attorney's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAt request of State Transfer to Judge Elizabeth V. Krier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 10/3/2022 8:30:00 AM due to Hurricane Ian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGVTGIE for 316.1935(3)(a) issued on 08/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGVTGJE for 322.34(5) issued on 08/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGVTGKE for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 08/22/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 7; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-09-12; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 6; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargeDrive while License Suspended, Revoked Habitual Offender; Count: 5; Statute #: 322.34(5); Citation #: AGVTGJE; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargeSmuggle Contraband - any Drug into County Detention Facility; Count: 4; Statute #: 951.22(1)(h); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Citation #: AGVTGKE; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • ChargeFlee, Attempt to Elude Drive at High Speed or with Wanton Disregard for Safety Person, Property LEO with Lights Sirens Activated; Count: 1; Statute #: 316.1935(3)(a); Citation #: AGVTGIE; Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-10-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less