This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/06/2022 at 08:06:10 (UTC).

Reyes, Alfonso Rafael

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Reyes, Alfonso Rafael was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Reyes, Alfonso Rafael

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/22/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/22/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

11/22/2022: Driving Record

First Appearance Court Order

11/23/2022: First Appearance Court Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/22/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/19/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less