This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/21/2022 at 10:01:06 (UTC).

Randall, Michael Aaron

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Randall, Michael Aaron was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Randall, Michael Aaron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brown, Christopher Hayden

Van-Sickle, Andrew Richard

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

06/22/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

06/22/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

06/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580440438-3; Count: 1

06/22/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580440438-3; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

06/23/2022: Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

06/23/2022: Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice Of Filing Executive Order

07/13/2022: Notice Of Filing Executive Order

Notice Of Case Action

07/14/2022: Notice Of Case Action

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/14/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice Of Filing Executive Order

07/12/2022: Notice Of Filing Executive Order

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/14/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Re-notice to Appear

07/25/2022: Re-notice to Appear

Answer to Demand for Discovery/Discovery Disclosure

07/25/2022: Answer to Demand for Discovery/Discovery Disclosure

Notice to Appear

08/15/2022: Notice to Appear

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketContinued to 10/13/2022 1:30 PM Case Mgmt (Private Attorney) Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAt request of State Transfer to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Mcgowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/18/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $5,000.00; 580440438-3; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketAccessory After The Fact 496.410 Fail To Register As Professional Solicitor; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • ChargeOperate in Violation, Fail to Comply with Solicitation of Contributions Act; Count: 1; Statute #: 496.415(1); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-08-15; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW RICHARD VANSICKLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Christopher Hayden