This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/21/2023 at 21:20:42 (UTC).

Pugh, Hersueen V, PUGH, HERSUEEN VINCENT Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Pugh, Hersueen V, PUGH, HERSUEEN VINCENT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Adams, Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Adams, Blake

 

Party Details

Defendants

Pugh, Hersueen V

PUGH, HERSUEN V

PUGH, HERSUEEN VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Newkirk, Amanda M

PD, Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/03/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/03/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/03/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/03/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/03/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/03/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/18/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 1/25/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Adams, Blake (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 810.09(2)(A) Trespass Property Other Than Structure, Conveyance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • ChargeTrespass Property Other than Structure, Conveyance; Count: 1; Statute #: 810.09(2)(a); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less