This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/04/2023 at 09:00:31 (UTC).

Porro Rodriguez, Dawn Marie

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 Porro Rodriguez, Dawn Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Porro Rodriguez, Dawn Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

Casasola, Ricardo A

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/07/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/07/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/07/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/07/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

12/08/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/14/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/16/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/20/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNo Trespass Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.568(2)(A) Fraudulent Use Of Personal Identification Information; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)1 Grand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • ChargeFraudulent Use of Personal Identification Information; Count: 2; Statute #: 817.568(2)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • ChargeGrand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(2)(c)1; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less