This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 09:18:33 (UTC).

Peterson , William Robert

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Peterson , William Robert was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Peterson , William Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Gorman, Jeff T

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/16/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/16/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/16/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/16/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/16/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

12/16/2022: Driving Record

First Appearance Court Order

12/19/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

12/27/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

Citation # A3KI0DP for 316.1935(1) issued on 12/15/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

01/03/2023: Citation # A3KI0DP for 316.1935(1) issued on 12/15/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

Notice of Appearance from Gorman, Jeff T, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

01/06/2023: Notice of Appearance from Gorman, Jeff T, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Discovery

01/06/2023: Notice of Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Gorman, Jeff T, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # A3KI0DP for 316.1935(1) issued on 12/15/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: RC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/16/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/9/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 316.1935(1) Fail To Obey Leo Order To Stop After Stopping Fleeing, Attempt To Elude Leo; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • ChargeFail to Obey LEO Order to Stop After Stopping Fleeing, Attempt to Elude LEO; Count: 1; Statute #: 316.1935(1); Citation #: A3KI0DP; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less