This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/04/2023 at 09:00:40 (UTC).

Peterson , William Robert

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 Peterson , William Robert was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Peterson , William Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Dickson, David William

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

01/03/2023: Notice to Appear

Demand for Discovery

12/29/2022: Demand for Discovery

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/28/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/28/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

12/16/2022: Driving Record

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/16/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/16/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Order Revoking Bond(s) 2022-Dd-008978, 2022-Cc-013021, Defendant is in Custody

12/16/2022: Order Revoking Bond(s) 2022-Dd-008978, 2022-Cc-013021, Defendant is in Custody

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/16/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/14/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $25,000.00; 2022-Cc-013021; Count: 2

12/12/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $25,000.00; 2022-Cc-013021; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $50,000.00; 2022-Dd-008978; Count: 1

12/12/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Sharda Williams for $50,000.00; 2022-Dd-008978; Count: 1

Inventory of Firearms

12/13/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

12/13/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

12/13/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Email Permission Form

12/12/2022: Email Permission Form

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

12/07/2022: JIS Certificate

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketContinued to 2/23/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/7/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 914.22(1)(E) Hinder Witness Communication/Information To Leo/Judge In 1St Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • ChargeTamper with Witness withhold Testimony/Information in 3rd Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 2; Statute #: 914.22(1)(a); Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2023-01-03; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-03; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less