This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/19/2022 at 10:04:12 (UTC).

Perez Medina, Jose Luis

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Perez Medina, Jose Luis was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Joseph G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Joseph G

 

Party Details

Defendant

Perez Medina, Jose Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Farrell, Laura Marie

Brown, Christopher Hayden

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/18/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/18/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Email Permission Form

01/18/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-819644; Count: 1

01/18/2022: Surety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-819644; Count: 1

Driving Record

01/19/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

01/20/2022: Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

01/20/2022: Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

02/09/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

02/10/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Clerk

02/10/2022: Notice to Clerk

Notice to Appear

02/14/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

02/23/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

03/01/2022: Notice to Appear

Deferred Prosecution Agreement

03/09/2022: Deferred Prosecution Agreement

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

03/09/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: JGF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCancelled Early Resolution Hearings on 3/28/2022 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeferred Prosecution Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: JGF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketContinued to 3/28/2022 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings Foster, Joseph G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRequest of Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 2/14/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Manalich, Ramiro (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-819644; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Court Action: Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-03-09; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-02-14; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less