This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/17/2023 at 08:12:09 (UTC).

Norbut Eickelman, Danielle

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Norbut Eickelman, Danielle was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Norbut Eickelman, Danielle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/03/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/03/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/03/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/03/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/03/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/03/2023: First Appearance Court Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/23/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 843.02 Resist/Obstruct Officer Without Violence; Count: 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(B) Possess Marijuana < 20 Grams; Count: 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(1)(A)2 Possession Of Synthetic Cannabinoids; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargeResist/Obstruct Officer without Violence; Count: 6; Statute #: 843.02; Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargePossess Marijuana < 20 grams; Count: 5; Statute #: 893.13(6)(b); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargePossession of Synthetic Cannabinoids; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(1)(a)2; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less