This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/16/2023 at 07:08:34 (UTC).

Nolley , Chastity Marie

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Nolley , Chastity Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nolley , Chastity Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

 

Court Documents

Citation # AGW16JE for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 01/06/2023 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

01/09/2023: Citation # AGW16JE for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 01/06/2023 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

Booking Sheet

01/09/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/09/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/09/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/09/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/09/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/09/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Driving Record

01/09/2023: Driving Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/30/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AGW16JE for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 01/06/2023 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Citation #: AGW16JE; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less