This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/06/2023 at 09:07:26 (UTC).

Nargentino, Francesca

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Nargentino, Francesca was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Crown, Rob. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Crown, Rob

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nargentino, Francesca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Moffett, Alexis G

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/09/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/09/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/09/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/09/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/09/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

12/09/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778146; Count: 1

12/09/2022: Surety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778146; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778145; Count: 2

12/09/2022: Surety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778145; Count: 2

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/27/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

12/27/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

12/27/2022: Waiver of Appearance

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

01/03/2023: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

01/03/2023: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

01/03/2023: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Misdemeanor on 1/4/2023 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 1/4/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778145; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Bail out of Jail - Dorika Laing for $2,000.00; Aa22-778146; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(B) Possess Marijuana < 20 Grams; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • ChargePossess Marijuana < 20 grams; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2023-01-03; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2023-01-03; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less