This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 10:00:46 (UTC).

Museau, Daniel

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Museau, Daniel was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Museau, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

White, Christian D

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

06/08/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

06/08/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/08/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

06/08/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/08/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

06/09/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/10/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/14/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

Referred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 2,3, Case # 11-2022-MM-000980-AXXX-XX

06/29/2022: Referred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 2,3, Case # 11-2022-MM-000980-AXXX-XX

E-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

06/30/2022: E-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPer Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 7/5/2022 8:15:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReferred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 2,3, Case # 11-2022-MM-000980-AXXX-XX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/5/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 6/8/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket893.13(6)(B) Possess Marijuana < 20 Grams; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2022-06-29; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Transferred to Another Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • ChargePossess Marijuana < 20 grams; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2022-06-29; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Transferred to Another Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-06-29; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer White, Christian D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Laura Natasha