This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/17/2023 at 08:08:25 (UTC).

Michel JR, Moncito

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Michel JR, Moncito was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Michel JR, Moncito

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/03/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/03/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/03/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/03/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/03/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/04/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Email Permission Form

01/04/2023: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2023-Aa-003811; Count: 1

01/04/2023: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2023-Aa-003811; Count: 1

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

01/11/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

Notice of Hearing by Court for Defendants Request For Review Of Indigent Determination

01/11/2023: Notice of Hearing by Court for Defendants Request For Review Of Indigent Determination

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing by Court for Defendants Request For Review Of Indigent Determination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2023-Aa-003811; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: BA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 2:00 PM Adams, Blake (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/30/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less