This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/31/2022 at 10:08:07 (UTC).

Mccoy, Mia Faith Estella

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 Mccoy, Mia Faith Estella was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Mccoy, Mia Faith Estella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Gonzalez, Diane Muenze

 

Court Documents

Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-52035; Count: 2

08/31/2022: Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-52035; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-51652; Count: 1

08/31/2022: Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-51652; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $1,500.00; Ss-5-389160; Count: 3

08/31/2022: Surety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $1,500.00; Ss-5-389160; Count: 3

Citation # AGVTK1E for 316.1935(1) issued on 08/23/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

09/01/2022: Citation # AGVTK1E for 316.1935(1) issued on 08/23/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

Booking Sheet

09/01/2022: Booking Sheet

Booking Sheet

09/01/2022: Booking Sheet

Teletype

09/01/2022: Teletype

First Appearance Court Order

09/01/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

09/01/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

09/01/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice to Appear

09/01/2022: Notice to Appear

Driving Record

09/01/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

09/16/2022: Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

09/16/2022: Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCHARGES CONSOLIDATED TO - 11-2022-CF-001502-CXXX-XX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 316.1935(1) Fail To Obey Leo Order To Stop After Stopping Fleeing, Attempt To Elude Leo; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)1 Grand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # XTCATS for 316.1935(1) issued on 08/23/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $1,500.00; Ss-5-389160; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-52035; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Donte's Bail Bonds - Donte Mitchell for $10,000.00; Ss-15-51652; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • ChargeResist/Obstruct Officer without Violence; Count: 3; Statute #: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2022-09-22; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Consolidated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • ChargeFail to Obey LEO Order to Stop After Stopping Fleeing, Attempt to Elude LEO; Count: 2; Statute #: 316.1935(1); Disposition Date: 2022-09-22; Citation #: XTCATS; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Consolidated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • ChargeGrand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(2)(c)1; Disposition Date: 2022-09-22; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Consolidated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less