This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 08:05:59 (UTC).

Mccafferty , Samantha Michelle

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Mccafferty , Samantha Michelle was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Mccafferty , Samantha Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/30/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/30/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/30/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/30/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/30/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

12/30/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Bb-015918; Count: 1

12/30/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Bb-015918; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Bb-015919; Count: 2

12/30/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Bb-015919; Count: 2

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Bb-015919; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Bb-015918; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/23/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(B) Possess Marijuana < 20 Grams; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargePossess Marijuana < 20 grams; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(b); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less